Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Bank
Sponsored by
Delegate Clagett
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Transportation Infrastructure Bank as a special revolving loan fund in the Transportation Trust Fund to provide loans and other financial assistance for transportation projects; establishing the Bank as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the Department of Transportation to administer the Bank; specifying the contents of the Bank; requiring that interest on money in the Bank and specified payments be credited to the Bank; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2013 Text - First - Transportation Infrastructure Bank
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-101 through 9-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM