Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Anderton, Aumann, Beitzel, Carozza, Clark, Cluster, Corderman, Hornberger, Krebs, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Morgan, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland corporate income tax for certain dividends included in federal taxable income as a result of a certain repatriation holiday enacted by federal legislation; requiring the Comptroller to provide for the administration of the Act if certain federal legislation is enacted; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0166
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM