Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices
Sponsored by
Delegate P. Young
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "other tobacco products" to exclude a certain item; requiring a person located outside the State to have a certain license in order to sell premium cigars or pipe tobacco to a consumer in the State; requiring the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission to issue a certain license; authorizing the holder of a remote tobacco seller license to sell premium cigars and pipe tobacco to consumers in the State; establishing the requirements for an applicant for a remote tobacco seller license; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0883
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {355868/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {313025/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-11)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-19)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Text - First - Tobacco Tax – Out–of–State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {355868/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Floor Amendment {313025/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (121-11) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Referred Rules 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable with Amendments {223922/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (116-19) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices
(   16.9-101 through 16.9-214 )
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 11:32 AM
Click to return on the top page