Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Cluster, Corderman, Glass, Malone, McComas, McConkey, Rey, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring individuals who apply to register to vote after June 30, 2018, to submit proof of United States citizenship; providing that individuals who are not citizens of the United States are not qualified to be registered voters; requiring an applicant for voter registration to submit certain documents or information to prove United States citizenship; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0539 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-102, 3-103, 3-202, 3-501, 9-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM