Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights
Sponsored by
Delegates Swain, Vaughn, and Tarrant
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified meetings of a cooperative housing corporation to be open to the members of the cooperative housing corporation or their agents; requiring the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation to keep books and records in a specified manner, and to cause an audit of the books and records under specified circumstances; establishing a specified dispute settlement mechanism for specified complaints or demands arising between specified cooperative housing corporations and their members; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0865
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {900214/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {900214/2 Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 66
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-6B-01, 5-6B-18.1 through 5-6B-18.6, 5-6B-19, 5-6B-19 through 5-6B-21, 5-6B-20, 5-6B-27, 5-6B-28 through 5-6B-31 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM