Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Assistance Programs - Fraud and Abuse Prevention
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Barve, Carr, Cullison, Feldman, Lee, Luedtke, A. Miller, Mizeur, and S. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to implement specified prepayment systems to prevent fraud and abuse in the payment of claims for the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and the Maryland Children's Health Program; requiring the Department to use specified information to refine and enhance a specified system; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1001 through 15-1004, 15-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM