Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Recreational Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Oaks, Rosenberg, Anderson, Branch, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Hammen, Hayes, Haynes, McCray, McIntosh, and B. Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the proceeds of table games paid to Baltimore City to be used for recreational facilities may only be used to supplement and not supplant existing expenses or obligations related to recreational facilities; and making the Act subject to a specified contingency.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM