Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest - Political Consulting
Sponsored by
Delegate McMillan
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Designating a contractual or temporary employee of a State's Attorney paid at a rate equivalent to at least State grade level 16 as a public official for a certain purpose; prohibiting an official or employee from being employed by or having a financial interest in an entity that provides political consulting services to State or local officials or candidates; and providing the requirement to file a financial disclosure statement excludes a contractual or temporary employee.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Ethics Law – Conflicts of Interest – Political Consulting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {530212/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest - Political Consulting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {524831/1
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {524831/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {933221/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, McMillan and R. Lewis)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, McMillan and R. Lewis)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zucker, Waugh and Bates)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zucker, Waugh and Bates)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {373427/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Public Ethics Law – Conflicts of Interest – Political Consulting
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {530212/1 Adopted 48
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest - Political Consulting
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {524831/1 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {524831/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Amendment {933221/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0) 61
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, McMillan and R. Lewis) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, McMillan and R. Lewis) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zucker, Waugh and Bates) 66
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zucker, Waugh and Bates) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Conference Committee Report {373427/1 Adopted 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 69
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-103, 5-502, 5-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM