Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
Sponsored by
Delegates D.E. Davis, Adams, T. Branch, Brooks, Carey, Miller, Rogers, and Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Revising provisions relating to the Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority; altering the application and scope of certain provisions relating to underground facilities and damage prevention; requiring certain newly installed underground facilities to be detectable or locatable on or after October 1, 2021; requiring certain previously detectable or locatable facilities to be restored to a certain status after a certain date; altering the qualifications of certain members of the Authority; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0877
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/28/2020 11:55 AM