Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Short-Term Disability Insurance for Pregnancy - Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, A. Kelly, Cullison, Kaiser, Pena-Melnyk, and S. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified employers to offer specified short-term disability insurance to employees who are pregnant; requiring, under specified circumstances, the employer to pay a specified percentage of the premium costs of the short-term disability insurance; requiring that the short-term disability insurance provide income replacement for a specified number of days for specified employees; specifying the percentage of income that must be replaced under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Hearing cancelled (Economic Matters)
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM