Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Glass, Malone, McComas, McConkey, Otto, Rey, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a physician, except under certain circumstances, from performing an abortion on an unmarried minor unless the physician obtains certain consent from the parent or guardian of the minor; authorizing a physician to perform an abortion on a minor without the consent of the minor's parent or guardian under certain circumstances; authorizing a minor to file a certain petition with a certain court for a certain waiver; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM