Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees
Sponsored by
Delegate Jackson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing certain retirees who began State service before July 1, 2011, to be eligible for prescription drug benefits in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; specifying that prescription drug benefits shall be discontinued for certain Medicare-eligible retirees who began State service on or after July 1, 2011, and their Medicare-eligible spouses and dependent children; repealing the Maryland State Retiree Prescription Drug Coverage Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1230 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page