Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Wholesalers - Payment on Delivery
Sponsored by
Delegates McKay, Beitzel, and Buckel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the forms of payment that a retail dealer may use to pay a holder of a wholesaler's license for the delivery of beer; and authorizing a holder of a wholesaler's license to accept payment on delivery from a retail dealer for the delivery of wine and liquor.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Wholesalers - Payment on Delivery
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Wholesalers - Payment on Delivery
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-501, 11-501, 13-501, 14-501, 16-501, 2-314, 23-501, 25-501, 26-501, 29-501, 31-501, 32-501, 33-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM