Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Guidelines
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Extending from October 1, 2021, to July 1, 2022, the effective date for certain provisions of law that would revise the schedule of basic child support obligations used to calculate the amount of a child support award and make other changes relating to the application of the Maryland Child Support Guidelines.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Support - Guidelines
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Child Support - Guidelines
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/24/2021 5:17 PM
Click to return on the top page