Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, the Medical and Chirurgical Faculty, and the State Board of Examiners in Optometry to define diseases and physical disabilities that may render an individual unable to exercise reasonable control over a motor vehicle; expanding the scope of health care professionals authorized to make a specified report to the Medical Advisory Board; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0807
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM