Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Radiation Machines - Registration Fees and Inspections
Sponsored by
Delegate K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt specified regulations for licensing and registration associated with radiation machines; requiring the fee schedule adopted by the Department of the Environment for the registration of radiation machines and other sources of radiation to be uniform within specified classes of radiation sources; repealing provisions of law that, for radiation machines in dental offices or facilities, establish specified maximum registration fees; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0717
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM