Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Applications - Notification and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Davis, Stein, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of State Police to provide notice of a specified denial of a handgun qualification license application or specified disapproval of a firearm application within a specified amount of time after a denial or disapproval to specified agencies; providing information that must be included in a specified notification; requiring agencies that receive a notification of application denial or disapproval to meet specified annual reporting requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0944
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-117.1, 5-117.2, 5-122 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM