Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Rate of Assessment and Term of Agreements
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Barron, Platt, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the rate at which the land of certain country clubs and golf courses is assessed for property tax purposes; establishing a maximum term of 5 years for certain agreements between the State Department of Assessments and Taxation and certain country clubs or golf courses; and applying the Act to certain agreements and to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Rate of Assessment and Term of Agreements
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-212, 8-213 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM