Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, B. Barnes, Haynes, Hettleman, Korman, and Stein
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland 529 Board to develop an application form for a certain State contribution program that includes certain information; requiring the Governor to provide appropriations of $5,000,000 in fiscal year 2018 and $3,000,000 in fiscal year 2019 and each fiscal year thereafter; altering the name of the Maryland College Investment Plan and Prepaid College Trust to refer to Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer; altering the date by which the Board is required to develop and implement an outreach and marketing plan; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0933
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {194863/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland College Investment Plan – State Match Requirement – Revisions
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {194863/1 Adopted 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
Text - Third - College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-1901, 18-1902.1, 18-1903, 18-1904, 18-1909, 18-19A-01, 18-19A-02, 18-19A-03, 18-19A-04.1, 18-19A-05, 18-19A-06, 18-19B-05, 18-19C-05 )
(   10-740 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM