Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Repackaged and Relabeled Drugs - Fee Schedule and Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarrant, Bromwell, Costa, Cullison, Krebs, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, Reznik, and V. Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Workers' Compensation Commission to adopt in regulation a pharmaceutical fee schedule applicable to repackaged and relabeled drugs; providing for the setting of reimbursement rates for specified drugs; requiring the Commission to impose a specified fine on an employer or its insurer under specified circumstances; requiring that a pharmaceutical bill submitted to an employer or its insurer for reimbursement of specified drugs contain specified information; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0507
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-663, 9-664, 9-665 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM