Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits
Sponsored by
Delegate McHale (By Request - Maryland Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council) and Delegates Malone, Clippinger, and Hammen
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the credit against the State income tax for the costs of purchasing qualified electric vehicle recharging equipment; establishing, for fiscal years 2015 through 2017, the Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program to provide rebates to individuals and entities for the costs of acquiring and installing vehicle recharging equipment; extending the credit against the motor vehicle excise tax for specified qualified plug-in electric drive vehicles for a specified period of time; requiring a report; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0908
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {720313/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-9)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {509537/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-17)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {720313/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (128-9) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {509537/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (119-17) 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2001, 9-2009, 9-20B-05 )
(   10-729 )
(   13-815 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM