Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, Brooks, Cardin, Hettleman, and Stein
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Amending certain prior authorizations of State Debt to alter the requirement that certain grantees provide certain matching funds; extending the deadline for certain grantees to present certain evidence that a matching fund will be presented; extending the termination date of certain grants; changing the locations of certain capital projects; altering the purposes of certain grants; changing the names of certain grantees; altering the authorized uses of certain grants; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954065/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-1)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {689738/1
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {689738/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {203121/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018 - Baltimore County - Road and Intersection Improvements
House 2/22/2019 2/25/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {954065/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-1) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:45 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {689738/1 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {689738/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Floor Amendment {203121/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Text - Chapter - Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
(   2012, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page