Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Delegates Braveboy, Anderson, Branch, Burns, Carr, Carter, Conaway, Davis, Glenn, Gutierrez, Harper, Haynes, Healey, Howard, Hucker, Ivey, McHale, Mitchell, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, B. Robinson, Stukes, Summers, Swain, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Hammen, Pendergrass, Cullison, A. Kelly, Reznik, and Tarrant
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of State Police, when it advertises for or recruits new employees, to include advertising that is targeted toward underrepresented communities and individuals; requiring the Department to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1 of each year on initiatives the Department has employed to improve diversity in recruitment and the outcome of those initiatives; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0868
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {646387/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-24)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/15/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {646387/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/17/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (111-24) 50
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 63
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-402, 2-402.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM