Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderton, Kipke, Sample-Hughes, Adams, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to require any additional information from a pharmacy benefits manager that may be reasonably necessary to verify information in a certain application; requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to establish a certain process by which a certain pharmacy has access to certain maximum allowable cost price lists in an electronic format; applying the Act to all contracts between a pharmacy benefits manager and a pharmacy entered into or in effect on or after January 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1079
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {396081/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {587573/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {396081/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable with Amendments {587573/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Text - Chapter - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1604, 15-1605, 15-1607, 15-1611, 15-1628.1, 15-1642 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM