Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Bromwell, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Elliott, Hammen, Hubbard, Kach, A. Kelly, McDonough, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Attorney General to take specified actions relating to investigations of alleged violations of laws relating to charitable organizations and charitable representatives; providing that a specified enforcement action or other remedy is subject to specified immunity or limitation on liability; requiring that an action to enforce specified provisions of the Act be brought within a specified period of time; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0964
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014, October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {426286/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {208673/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {426286/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {208673/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6.5-101 through 6.5-105, 6-205, 6-206, 6-2A-01, 6-302, 6-402, 6-407, 6-5A-02, 6-621, 6-622 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM