Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Disclosure Requirements - Death by Other Than Natural Causes
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Eliminating immunity from civil liability or criminal penalty for an owner or seller of real property or the owner's or seller's agent who fails to disclose a homicide, suicide, accidental death, or felony that occurred on a property offered for sale or lease; and requiring a residential property disclaimer or disclosure statement to include information of which a vendor has actual knowledge relating to any death by other than natural causes, such as a homicide, suicide, or accidental death, that occurred at a property.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-702, 2-120 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM