Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Application Fee and Mental Health Certification
Sponsored by
Delegate Costa
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Increasing a specified firearm application fee; reducing the number of consecutive days that an applicant may not exceed in a medical institution for treatment of a mental disorder without a specified certification from a licensed mental health physician or under specified supervision; requiring a firearm application to be accompanied by a specified certificate from a licensed mental health physician issued within a specified period before the date of the application; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 3/21/2013 3/23/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-118, 5-133, 5-134 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM