Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and Installation
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, Angel, Carter, Conaway, Gutierrez, Malone, McKay, McMillan, Morgan, Oaks, Parrott, Rey, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Simonaire, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to authorize a customer of a gas company or an electric company to purchase and install an analog meter; requiring the meter to comply with specified standards; requiring a gas company or an electric company to install the meter or allow specified persons to install the meter at the customer's request; providing that an analog meter may replace a different type of meter; prohibiting a gas company or an electric company from requiring the customer to install additional controls; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0508 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   7-301, 7-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page