Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Repeating Previous Grade Level – Authorization (Education Recovery Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegate Griffith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
On request of the student, parent, or guardian, authorizing certain students, regardless of the student's age or whether the student had completed all promotion or graduation requirements for the grade level the student seeks to repeat for the 2021-2022 school year, to repeat the grade level they were in during the 2020-2021 school year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education – Repeating Previous Grade Level – Authorization (Education Recovery Act of 2021)
House 3/10/2021 3/11/2021 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page