Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Highways – Maryland Route 208 – Jurisdiction
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarlau, Fennell, and Sanchez
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State, on request by the Town of Brentwood, Prince George's County, to assume ownership of Maryland Route 208 from Rhode Island Avenue to the border of the Town of Brentwood and the City of Hyattsville, Prince George's County.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Highways – Maryland Route 208 – Jurisdiction
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Highways – Maryland Route 208 – Jurisdiction
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-633, 8-634 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM