Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Health Insurer Concentration - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Morgan, Reilly, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of the Attorney General to conduct a study to examine health insurer concentration in the State to determine the competitiveness of the market; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to take certain actions in conducting the study; and requiring the Office of the Attorney General to submit its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the Senate Finance Committee, and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before December 1, 2020.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Health Insurer Concentration - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Health Insurer Concentration - Study
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 10:40 AM