Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Related to Inventions and Patents
Sponsored by
Delegate Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public senior higher education institution from qualifying to receive student financial assistance or research funding from the State unless the institution adopts specified policies relating to inventions and patents; specifying that the policy must encompass specified requirements; prohibiting an institution from assigning or exclusively licensing a patent to a patent assertion entity; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Related to Inventions and Patents
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM