Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Out-of-Pocket Maximums and Cost-Sharing Requirements - Calculation
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Barve, Carr, Gilchrist, Kipke, and R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, to the extent authorized under federal law, certain entities to include payments made by certain persons when calculating certain contributions to an out-of-pocket maximum or a cost-sharing requirement for an insured, a subscriber, or a member; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0623
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Out-of-Pocket Maximums and Cost-Sharing Requirements - Calculation
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-118 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page