Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Corderman, and Glass
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allocating certain motor fuel tax revenue to a certain account that is shared with local governments; increasing the portion of highway user revenue that is distributed to local governments; altering the allocation of the local share of highway user revenue; proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution mandating that revenue be credited to a certain account and distributed from that account in a certain manner; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0552 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1103 )
(   8-402, 8-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM