Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Robbery, Burglary, or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Atterbeary, Carter, Conaway, Dumais, Glass, Malone, McComas, Moon, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, Sydnor, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that the crime of robbery includes robbing or attempting to rob another of specified controlled dangerous substances; establishing the offense of breaking and entering the storehouse of another with the intent to steal, take, or carry away controlled dangerous substances; clarifying that the crime of theft includes the theft of controlled dangerous substances; providing a specified person be ordered to undergo a specified drug assessment and entered into a specified drug addiction treatment program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0949
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-401, 3-402, 6-201, 6-203, 7-101, 7-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM