Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Law Enforcement Officers - Compensatory Leave - Cash Compensation and Creditable Service
Sponsored by
Delegates Cluster, Barnes, Bromwell, DeBoy, Guzzone, McDermott, and Olszewski
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that specified State law enforcement officers are entitled to receive compensation for 250 hours of unused compensatory leave earned during each calendar year; establishing that specified State law enforcement officers who receive a salary increase due to a promotion are entitled to receive compensation for any unused compensatory leave, but may only receive the compensation at the State law enforcement officer's salary rate before the increase; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-206, 9-901, 9-902 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM