Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Calculation of Employees (Fair Sick Leave and Holiday Compensation Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Ali, Mosby, and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Specifying, for purposes of determining whether an employer is required to provide paid or unpaid earned sick and safe leave in accordance with certain provisions of law, that, if an employer or a franchisor has more than one business location in the State, the number of employees at each location shall be aggregated.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Calculation of Employees (Fair Sick Leave and Holiday Compensation Act)
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM