Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Operation in School Zones (Truth in Speed Cameras Act of 2018)
Sponsored by
Delegates Wivell, Ciliberti, Krebs, Long, McComas, McKay, Parrott, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a local jurisdiction place a certain device adjacent to a sign indicating a school zone before activating a speed monitoring system; altering the hours during which a speed monitoring system in a school zone may be operated and restricting the placement of a speed monitoring system to certain areas in a school zone; limiting the fee that a contractor may receive for operating a speed monitoring system; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Operation in School Zones (Truth in Speed Cameras Act of 2018)
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM