Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Telecommunications Service Tax - Authorization
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti and Johnson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Harford County to impose, by law, and collect a sales and use tax on residential, nonresidential, and mobile telecommunications service in Harford County under certain circumstances; requiring that the tax be itemized on the telecommunications service bill and collected by the telecommunications service vendor on behalf of Harford County; providing that the net proceeds of the tax may be used only for expenditures of the Harford County public school system; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Telecommunications Service Tax - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Harford County - Telecommunications Service Tax - Authorization
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page