Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Regulation of Mortgage Lenders, Mortgage Loan Originators, and Money Transmitters - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a separate license for the principal executive office and each branch office of an applicant for a mortgage lender license and a mortgage lender licensee; requiring an applicant for a mortgage lender license or a license renewal to apply through the Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System and Registry (NMLS); requiring each applicant for a mortgage lender license to obtain a unique identifier from NMLS; authorizing the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to keep a specified license fee under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-501, 11-505, 11-506.1, 11-507, 11-509, 11-510, 11-511, 11-512, 11-513, 11-513.1, 11-514, 11-601, 11-602, 11-603, 11-603.1, 11-604, 11-606, 11-606.1, 11-609, 11-612, 11-620, 11-621, 11-622, 12-401, 12-405, 12-407, 12-408, 12-408.1, 12-410, 12-411, 12-412, 12-415, 12-416, 12-430.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM