Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a holder of a lien created under Title 16, Subtitle 2 of the Commercial Law Article, including an auctioneer and a company known as a lien and recovery company, from specified licensing requirements solely for the purpose of selling vessels in accordance with Title 16 of the Commercial Law Article.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1083
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-701, 8-710 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM