Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Office Discipline Referrals in Anne Arundel County Public Schools
Sponsored by
Delegate S. Howard
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Office Discipline Referrals in Anne Arundel County Public Schools; requiring the Commission, beginning with the 2016-2017 school year, to track office discipline referrals made in county schools; requiring the Anne Arundel County Board of Education, by September 1 each year, to submit to the Commission specified information on referrals made during the preceding school year; requiring the Commission, on an ongoing basis, to continue to track referrals, monitor outcomes, and make recommendations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM