Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County Student Loan Refinancing Authority
Sponsored by
Delegate Lisanti
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing Harford County to create the Harford County Student Loan Refinancing Authority through an ordinance enacted by the Harford County governing body; establishing that the purpose of the Authority is to provide affordable financial assistance to enable County residents, graduates of county public schools, and other specified individuals to obtain a postsecondary education; requiring Harford County to take specified actions before establishing the Authority; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Contingency - on a contingency described in section 3 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {235965/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-8)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {235965/1 Report Adopted 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (126-8) 59
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 58
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-3101 through 18-3103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM