Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Carr, Glenn, Jackson, Korman, McCray, Moon, Morales, Platt, Sanchez, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified counties and municipal corporations to enact a local law, on or before December 31, 2018, to authorize collective bargaining between the county or municipal corporation and a specified employee organization; authorizing specified counties and municipal corporations to enact a local law to authorize collective bargaining between the county or municipal corporation and a specified employee organization; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0736 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-701 through 4-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM