Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Buckel, Ebersole, Hornberger, Mosby, Shoemaker, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program in the Department of Commerce; providing for the purposes of the Program; establishing qualifications for participation in the Program; requiring an applicant to submit a certain application; authorizing the Program to provide certain grants to certain nonprofit organizations and government agencies, subject to a certain limitation; establishing the Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0956
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1701 through 5-1705 )
(   2-301, 5-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM