Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Voluntary Exclusion
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher and Luedtke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a video lottery operation licensee to report to the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission the name of an individual on a specified voluntary exclusion list who enters or attempts to enter a video lottery facility; requiring a licensee to use specified procedures to remove a specified individual from a video lottery facility; authorizing a licensee, under specified circumstances, to request a law enforcement officer to remove specified individuals; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Voluntary Exclusion
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Voluntary Exclusion
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM