Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Beitzel
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Ibogaine Treatment Pilot Program; requiring the Program to begin on or before January 1, 2019, and to continue for 4 years; providing for the purposes of the Program; establishing the Ibogaine Treatment Pilot Program Advisory Board; providing for the purposes of and membership of the Advisory Board; requiring a specified health care facility to submit a specified proposal to participate in the Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Pilot Program
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1101 through 8-1108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM