Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utility Property - Operating Personal Property - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that the term "operating personal property", for purposes of the valuation, allocation, assessment, and apportionment of public utility property for property tax law, does not include street lighting equipment; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2013.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 8-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM