Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on Issuance
Sponsored by
Delegate Niemann
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Secretary of the Environment from issuing a permit to construct or materially alter an incinerator located within 3 miles of specified locations; prohibiting a person from constructing an incinerator within 3 miles of specified locations; altering the application of a specified prohibition on specified facilities operating on January 1, 1997; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM