Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Gross Receipts - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of gross receipts to exempt from the public service company franchise tax specified revenue that a public service company collects to offset local government taxes imposed based on electricity or natural gas delivered to residential property.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0692 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means and Economic Matters
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM